EP1865372 - Repair method for an active matrix display substrate using laser cutting and laser-assisted chemical vapour deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Ku-Hyun 109-2204 Dongsuwon LG Village 1cha Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
Shin, Dae-Keun 104-1201 Gyeryong Apt. No. 1078 Dujeong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 03 /
Song, Dae-Hyuk Cheongok-1206 Samsung Crystal Town Tangjeong-myeon Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010192.8 | 23.05.2007 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | KR20060051742 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060051742 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865372 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/136259 (EP,US);
G02F1/1343 (KR);
H01L21/76894 (EP,US);
G02F1/136263 (EP,US);
G02F1/136286 (EP,US);
G02F2201/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/34] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reparaturverfahren für das Substrat einer Anzeigevorrichtung mit aktiver Matrix mittels Laserschneidens und laserinduzierter chemischer Dampfabscheidung | [2007/50] | English: | Repair method for an active matrix display substrate using laser cutting and laser-assisted chemical vapour deposition | [2007/50] | French: | Procédé de réparation d'un substrat pour un système d'affichage à matrice active utilisant un procédé de découpe par laser et suivi d'un dépôt chimique en phase vapeur induit par laser | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001035920 (CHOI WOO HYUK [KR]) [A] 7,10,23,26 * figure 7E *; | [X]WO03081329 (TFPD CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,13,14,22 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004115840 (LAI HAN-CHUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * figures 3A-3C * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] *; | [PX]US2007081108 (TSUKADA ICHIRO [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0035] - [0066] * |