EP1860340 - Travel-driving mechanism for self-propelled working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Toshiaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2008/48] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Kawakami, Toshiaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010392.4 | 24.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20060144082 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006144082 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860340 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860340 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/16, A01D34/69, A01D69/02 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
A01D34/69 (EP,US);
A01D69/02 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L7/003 (EP,US);
F16D41/16 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US);
B60K2001/001 (EP,US);
B60L2200/40 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/32] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wegantriebsmechanismus für eine selbstangetriebene Arbeitsmaschine | [2007/48] | English: | Travel-driving mechanism for self-propelled working machine | [2007/48] | French: | Mécanisme de commande de voyage pour machine de travail autopropulsée | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1931109 (AS MOTOR GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph L * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4909365 (TILLOTSON HENRY B [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 7 - line 21 * * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 20 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 59 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2002185353 (BALLEW WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1,2,7,8,19 *; | [A]US2003037525 (IIDA TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0056] ** figures 1,7 *; | [DA]EP1526300 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,2 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 1-7d * |