EP2003563 - Method for debugging an automation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | Method for operating an automation device | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Change - German title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | 17.09.2010 | Change - English title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | 17.09.2010 | Change - French title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graw, Roland Alemannenweg 3 76479 Steinmauern / DE | [2008/51] | Application number, filing date | 07010395.7 | 24.05.2007 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2003563 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/36 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
G06F11/3648 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/35] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fehlersuche bei einem Automatisierungsgerät | [2010/42] | English: | Method for debugging an automation device | [2010/42] | French: | Procédé destiné au débogage d'un appareil d'automatisation | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/51] | Verfahren zur Fenlersuche bei einem Automatisierungsgerätes | ||
Former [2008/51] | Method for operating an automation device | ||
Former [2008/51] | Procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'un appareil d'automatisation | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4802116 (WARD DEREK [NZ], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 2a,2b,2c,2d *; | [X]US5940617 (TAMURA KAZUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 45 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 28 * * column 8, lines 28-48 *; | [X]US6003143 (KIM THOMAS DONGSUK [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, lines 14-47 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 5 * * column 11, lines 5-25 *; | [X]US6077312 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003061600 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] - [0015] *; | [A] - ROSENBERG J B ET AL, "How debuggers work", HOW DEBUGGERS WORK. ALGORITHMS, DATA STRUCTURES, AND ARCHITECTURE, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, (1996), ISBN 0-471-14966-7, pages 107 - 133, XP002351059 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |