EP1862917 - Data management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAD Solutions Limited 69 High Street Bagshot Surrey GU19 5AH / GB | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states DAD will do it Limited. 69 High Dtreet Bagshot Surrey GU19 5AH / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Ranger, Julia Crondall Lodge, Church Street Crondall, Farnham, Surrey GU10 5QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Oak House Oak End Way Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 8BR / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07010899.8 | 01.06.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | GB20060010803 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0610803 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862917 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1862917 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,GB);
G06F16/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | Datenverwaltung | [2007/49] | English: | Data management | [2007/49] | French: | Gestion de données | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/38] | 26.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/38] | 04.05.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0864990 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line L - page 9, line 13 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US2006036610 (WANG WEN-JIUNN [TW]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] * | Examination | - ABDESALAM HELAL ET AL, "UbiData: Requirements and Architecture for Ubiquitous Data Access", ACM SIGMOD RECORD, (20041201), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 71 - 76, XP055018042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1041410.1041423 |