EP1820452 - Ultrasonic diagnostic imaging method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/34] | Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and image processing apparatus | ||
[2018/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiyama, Naohisa 16-10, Shintomi-Cho 3-Chome Otawara-Shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07010953.3 | 28.04.2004 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | JP20030124168 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003124168 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820452 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820452 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06, A61B8/08, A61B8/13, G01S7/52, G01S15/89 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G01S15/8979 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US);
G01S7/52041 (EP,US);
G01S7/52038 (EP,US);
G01S7/52074 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | A61B8/00, A61B8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE [2018/31] |
Former [2007/34] | DE | Title | German: | Diagnostisches Ultraschall-Bildgebungsverfahren | [2018/09] | English: | Ultrasonic diagnostic imaging method | [2018/09] | French: | Procédé d'imagerie diagnostique à ultrasons | [2018/09] |
Former [2007/34] | Ultraschalldiagnosegerät und Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2007/34] | Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus and image processing apparatus | ||
Former [2007/34] | Appareil de diagnostic à ultrason et appareil de traitement d'images | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04252471.0 / EP1472981 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040252471) is 13.05.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002055681 (AVERKIOU MICHALAKIS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,14-17,21,22 * paragraphs [0006] , [0025] , [0026] , [0034] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] - [0051] - [0054] - [0059] * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 4,9,10,12,13,18-20; | [YA]US5215094 (FRANKLIN DONN D [US], et al) [Y] 10,12,13,19,20 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 37 * * column 5, line 1 - line 5 * * column 8, line 45 - line 50 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,15,22; | [YA]US6080107 (POLAND MCKEE D [US]) [Y] 4 * column 16, line 25 - line 29; figure 7 * [A] 1-3; | [A]US5873830 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, lines 1-5 * * column 4, line 25 - line 62 *; | [YA]US5971928 (DODD STIRLING S [US], et al) [Y] 9,18 * abstract * * column 5, lines 1-5 * * column 4, lines 25-40,58; figure 2 * [A] 8; | [A]US2001056236 (ANGELSEN BJORN [NO]) [A] 14-16 * paragraph [0102]; figure 10 *; | [A]WO02102251 (UNIV TASMANIA [AU], et al) [A] 14-16 * page 2, line 19 - line 32 * * page 6, line 25 - line 35 * |