EP1864622 - High-frequency treatment instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303, Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Muyari, Yuta Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Tsutomu Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
Miyajima, Chika Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 05 /
Okada, Tsutomu Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
Yahagi, Naohisa 6-6-23-303, Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Muyari, Yuta c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Tsutomu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Miyajima, Chika c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
Okada, Tsutomu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2007/50] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011059.8 | 05.06.2007 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | JP20060156392 | 05.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006156392 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1864622 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1864622 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864622 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, // A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B17/32056 (US);
A61B2017/00269 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2212 (US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1407 (EP,US);
A61B2018/141 (US);
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | A61B18/14, A61B17/32, // A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2017/40] |
Former [2009/03] | DE, FR, GB, IE | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzbehandlungsinstrument | [2007/50] | English: | High-frequency treatment instrument | [2007/50] | French: | Instrument de traitement utilisant des hautes fréquences | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14164119.1 / EP2756816 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.06.2018 | IE | 05.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/21] | GB | 05.06.2018 | |
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | IE | 05.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9942041 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * * page 13, line 9 - page 16, line 21 *; | [A]US6395001 (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]US2004002702 (XIAO JIA HUA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figures 9-11 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2006064113 (NAKAO NAOMI L [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 5-8,10,13,14,20-22,27 * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0095] * | by applicant | JPH08299355 | WO9942041 | US2004002702 | US2006064113 |