|
12.02.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.03.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.09.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.10.2012 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
22.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |