EP2014659 - New hybrid compounds of nucleobases and organic redox molecules and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Osnabrück Neuer Graben/Schloss 49069 Osnabrück / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asaftei, Simona Carmen Wetterskamp 5 49078, Osnabrück / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011179.4 | 07.06.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014659 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D473/40, C07H21/00, C09K9/02 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D473/40 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C09K9/02 (EP);
C09K2211/1007 (EP);
C09K2211/1011 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Neue hybride Verbindungen von Nukleinbasen und organischen Redoxmolekülen und ihre Verwendung | [2009/03] | English: | New hybrid compounds of nucleobases and organic redox molecules and their use | [2009/03] | French: | Nouveaux composés hybrides de bases nucléiques et molécules redox organiques et leur utilisation | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19735733 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,16-19 * page 24 - page 34 * [Y] 12-15; | [Y]EP0995786 (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP [JP]) [Y] 12 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6195192 (BAUMANN KELVIN L [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16-19 * example 2 * [Y] 12-15; | [X]WO02079191 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [X] 1-10 * examples 1-4 *; | [DX]WO2004067673 (NTERA LTD [IE], et al) [DX] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X] - CUSACK, LUCY ET AL, "Heterosupramolecular Chemistry: Self-Assembly of an Electron Donor (TiO2 Nanocrystallite)-Acceptor ( Viologen ) Complex", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS , 9(8), 1765-1772 CODEN: CMATEX; ISSN: 0897-4756, (1997), XP002470893 [X] 1-10 * scheme 5; page 1772 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm9605173 | [XY] - LIM, J.Y. ET AL., "Single- and dual-type electrochromic devices based on polycarbazole derivatives bearing pendent viologen", SYNTH. METALS, (2006), vol. x, no. 156, page 695, XP005497045 [X] 1-12,16-19 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.synthmet.2006.03.008 | [X] - ISO, YASUYOSHI ET AL, "Synthesis of viologen-tagged oligodeoxynucleotides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS , 33(4), 503-6 CODEN: TELEAY; ISSN: 0040-4039, (1992), XP002470895 [X] 1-10,19,20 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)93980-7 | [Y] - BAKER, WENDY S. ET AL, "Electrochemical and Spectroscopic Characterization of Viologen Functionalized Poly(Amidoamine) Dendrimers", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B , 105(37), 8885-8894 CODEN: JPCBFK; ISSN: 1089-5647, (2001), XP002470896 [Y] 13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp012473d | [Y] - HEINEN, SUSANNE ET AL, "Generation-dependent intramolecular CT complexation in a dendrimer electron sponge consisting of a viologen skeleton", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION , 39(4), 806-809 CODEN: ACIEF5; ISSN: 1433-7851, (2000), XP002470897 [Y] 13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(20000218)39:4<806::AID-ANIE806>3.0.CO;2-I |