EP1867611 - Method for preparing glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johns Manville 717 Seventeenth Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Johns Manville 717 Seventeenth Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Jon Frederick 8410 North Pinewood Drive Castle Rock Colorado 80108 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011233.9 | 08.06.2007 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | US20060451813 | 13.06.2006 Original published format: US 451813 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867611 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C03C1/02, C03B1/02 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
C03C1/02 (EP,US);
C03C1/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Glas | [2007/51] | English: | Method for preparing glass | [2007/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation pour le verre | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4019789 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * pages 4,5; examples 1-4 *; | [X]FR350340 (CHARLES DE LA ROCHE [FR]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2362984 (NII KAMJA I SILIKATOW) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]DD141512 (KOSCHWITZ NIKOLAUS, et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0826630 (MINERALS TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US4028131 (PONS ANDRE) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-20 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1282868 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3573887 (MOD WILLIAM A, et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3489578 (PUGH ASHLEY CEDRIC PARDOE) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 55-70 * |