EP1884614 - Hinge unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUSPA Holding GmbH Mühlweg 33 90518 Altdorf / DE | For all designated states Liebherr-Hausgeräte Ochsenhausen GmbH Memmingerstrasse 77 88411 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegner, Helge Am Reichswald 9 90518 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Resnik, Corinne Schulstrasse 14B 90518 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
Blersch, Dietmar Grangesstrasse 38 88521 Ertingen / DE | 04 /
Hecht, Josef Weiherstrasse 11 88416 Erlenmoos / DE | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Rau, Albrecht Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Rau, Albrecht Patentanwälte Rau, Schneck & Hübner Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011649.6 | 14.06.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | DE20061036473 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036473 | [2008/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884614 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1884614 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884614 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/10, E05F1/12, E05F5/00 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
E05F5/10 (EP,US);
E05F1/1066 (EP);
E05F1/1269 (EP);
E05F1/14 (EP);
E05F5/00 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/256 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2900/31 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2009/47] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Scharnier-Anordnung | [2008/06] | English: | Hinge unit | [2008/06] | French: | Agencement de charnière | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US658533 (SCHUYLER DANIEL [US]) [Y] 10 * page 2, lines 74-77 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US1386196 (MUNN NEIL D) [A] 8 * figure 2 *; | [XY]US1482917 (DURNO JOHN H) [X] 1-4,8 * page 1, line 56 - line 68 * * page 1, line 96 - line 100 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,10; | [X]US2585413 (SIMPSON HERBERT A) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 3, line 10 - line 15 * * column 3, line 73 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 2,4,5 *; | [YA]US4690468 (LAU ROBERT G [US]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 6,7; | [A]EP1359275 (ZIMMER GUENTHER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 9,10 * column 4, line 1 - line 16 ** figure 4 * | by applicant | US1482917 | US2585413 | DE20306043U |