EP2005834 - Method of making cheese [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invensys APV A/S Pasteursvej 1 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorsen, Claus Lunavej 18 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
Harbo, Erik Dath Haselgaardsvej 3 8210 Aarhus V / DK | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Friese, Martin, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Friese, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011770.0 | 15.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005834 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/00, A23C19/068, A23C19/09 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A23C19/082 (EP,US);
A23C19/0973 (EP,US);
A23C2250/054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/36] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Käse | [2008/52] | English: | Method of making cheese | [2008/52] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de fromage | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2006030128 (INGREDIA [FR], et al) [DX] 1-15,27-52 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 2; claim - * * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 31 *; | [XY]CN1644071 ; | [XY]WO9102461 (GEN FOODS INC [US]) [X] 53-55 * page 2, line 22 - line 29 * * page 3, line 22 - line 31 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 3 * * page 16, line 30 - page 23, line 34 * [Y] 1-55,1-55; | [XY]EP1576886 (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [DE]) [X] 53-55 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0016] - [0029]; claim - * [Y] 1-55; | [Y]EP0997073 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [Y] 1-55 * paragraph [0055]; example -; claim - * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 82, Database accession no. 2005-798871, XP002467736 & CN1644071 A 20050727 (LUO C) [X] 53-55 * abstract * [Y] 1-55 |