EP1868372 - Lens apparatus focus adjustment support device and focus adjusting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masumi David c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011804.7 | 15.06.2007 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | JP20060167286 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006167286 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868372 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/225 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G08B13/19619 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
G08B13/1963 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
H04N23/695 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung der Fokuseinstellung für eine Linsenvorrichtung und Fokuseinstellung | [2007/51] | English: | Lens apparatus focus adjustment support device and focus adjusting | [2007/51] | French: | Dispositif de support de mise au point d'un appareil à lentille et mise au point | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 14.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3993866 (PEARL DAVID L, et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]EP0873010 (FIFTY CYCLE VIDEO LASER DEVICE [TW]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2006103755 (COSTIGAN GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [AP]JP2007006397 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [AP] * abstract * |