EP1873039 - Method for adjusting the steering range of the electrical steering for an industrial truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Am Stadtrand 35 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramer, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Gross-Sabiner-Ring 11 24558 Ulzburg / DE | 02 /
Steiner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Gölm 19 22965 Todendorf / DE | 03 /
von Thienen, Nils, Dipl.-Ing. Habichtstrasse 96 22305 Hamburg / DE | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schildberg, Peter Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Schildberg, Peter Patentanwalt Hauck Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011931.8 | 19.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | DE20061029587 | 28.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006029587 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1873039 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1873039 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873039 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D15/02 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B62D5/0457 (EP);
B62D15/0245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/27] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung eines Lenkbereichs bei einer elektrischen Lenkung für ein Flurförderzeug | [2008/01] | English: | Method for adjusting the steering range of the electrical steering for an industrial truck | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé destiné au réglage de la plage d'angle pour une direction électrique pour un chariot de manutention | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 27.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 09.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
01.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Linde Material Handling GmbH Carl-von-Linde-Platz 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE Opponent's representative Waller, Stefan Waller-IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landsberger Str. 155 / Haus 1 3. Stock 80637 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
01.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Linde Material Handling GmbH Carl-von-Linde-Platz 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE Opponent's representative Waller, Stefan Geirhos & Waller Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | 07.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.03.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/36] | 08.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.04.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE19714786 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [DX] 1 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE19511301 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [DX] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004016493 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0967135 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2848974 (SOC MECANIQUE IRIGNY [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1447306 (BT IND [SE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2856147 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19714786 | DE19511301 |