EP1879351 - Method and apparatus for data framing in a wireless communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Sonic Limited Offshore incorporations centre Road Town P.O. Box 957 Tortola / VG | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiang, Sam Shiaw-Shiang 4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Tseng, Li-Chih 4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei City / TW | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011987.0 | 19.06.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | US20060805342P | 21.06.2006 Original published format: US 805342 P | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879351 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q7/38 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
H04L1/0079 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1812 (EP,KR);
H04L63/162 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Datenrahmen in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2008/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for data framing in a wireless communications system | [2008/03] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour assembler des données en trame dans un système de communication sans fil | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 19.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |