EP1870023 - Ophthalmologic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hideshima, Masayuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 02 /
Nunokawa, Kazuo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 03 /
Fujino, Makoto c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 04 /
Iwa, Yoichiro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 05 /
Miwa, Akemi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 06 /
Goto, Yoshiaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 07 /
Takeuchi, Gaku c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 08 /
Tanabe, Takao c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2009/16] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
Hideshima, Masayuki Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | ||
02 /
Nunokawa, Kazuo Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
03 /
Fujino, Makoto Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
04 /
Iwa, Yoichiro Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
05 /
Miwa, Akemi Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
06 /
Goto, Yoshiaki Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
07 /
Takeuchi, Gaku Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | |||
08 /
Tanabe, Takao Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys "Patenta" Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012047.2 | 20.06.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | JP20060172769 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006172769 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870023 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870023 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/113, A61B3/12 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61B3/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | Ophthalmologisches Gerät | [2007/52] | English: | Ophthalmologic apparatus | [2007/52] | French: | Appareil ophtalmologique | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 05.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | IT | 15.04.2009 | LT | 15.04.2009 | LV | 15.04.2009 | MT | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | IE | 20.06.2009 | LU | 20.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | IS | 15.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
MT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
LU | 20.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
MT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
LU | 20.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9923936 (IRVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [AD]US5943115 (FERGUSON R DANIEL [US]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1480552 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005254008 (FERGUSON R D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 12 * | by applicant | US5943115 |