EP1887557 - Conga stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roland Meinl Musikinstrumente GmbH & Co. KG An der Herrenbergen 24 91413 Neustadt/Aisch / DE | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinl, Reinhold An den Weinbergen 6 91413 Neustadt/Aisch / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012119.9 | 21.06.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20062012132U | 08.08.2006 Original published format: DE 202006012132 U | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887557 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1887557 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887557 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G10D13/02 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G10D13/28 (EP,US);
G10D13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Conga-Ständer | [2008/07] | English: | Conga stand | [2008/07] | French: | Support de conga | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | DK | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | IE | 09.06.2010 | IT | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | MT | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | ES | 20.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | PT | 11.10.2010 | HU | 10.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9206877U (AFRO PERCUSSION, BRUNSSUM, NL) [A] 1* page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 1; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE102004063371 (ROLAND MEINL MUSIKINSTRUMENTE [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * |