EP1895138 - Cover structure of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Negoro, Masaaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Kurosu, Reina c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Wakita, Nobutaka c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2011/11] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
Negoro, Masaaki Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Kurosu, Reina Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Wakita, Nobutaka Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012522.4 | 26.06.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060230952 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006230952 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1895138 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1895138 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1895138 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00, B62J13/00, F01P11/04 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
F01P11/04 (EP,US);
F02F7/007 (EP,US);
F02F7/0073 (EP,US);
F02B61/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | F02F7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2011/19] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abdeckungsstruktur für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2008/10] | English: | Cover structure of an internal combustion engine | [2008/10] | French: | Structure de couvercle d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 18.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01139024U (HONDA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP7055291Y (HONDA) [AD] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2005217629 (THURM KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2, 4 * |