EP1873481 - Oblique incidence interferometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2017/06] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states MITUTOYO CORPORATION 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Kazuhiko Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yoshimasa Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | 03 /
Ootao, Reiya Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | [2017/06] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Kawasaki, Kazuhiko Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Yoshimasa Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | |||
03 /
Ootao, Reiya Mitutoyo Corporation 430-1, Kamiyokoba Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/06] |
Former [2008/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012811.1 | 29.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | JP20060180573 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006180573 | JP20070141556 | 29.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007141556 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873481 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873481 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G01B9/02019 (EP,US);
G01B9/02022 (EP,US);
G01B9/02028 (EP,US);
G01B9/02057 (EP,US);
G01B2290/45 (EP,US);
G01B2290/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/06] |
Former [2008/37] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Interferometer mit schräger Einstrahlung | [2016/31] | English: | Oblique incidence interferometer | [2008/01] | French: | Interféromètre à incidence oblique | [2008/01] |
Former [2008/01] | Interferometer unter Anwendung von schräg einfallenden Lichts | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0226658 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [DA]JPH04286904 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [DA] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0575095 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A] - OTANI, Y. ET AL, Precise measurement of nonoptical surface by oblique incidence interferometer, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, SPIE CONFERENCE ON LASER INTERFEROMETRY IX, (1998), 3478, XP002451231 [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 214 - page 215 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.312939 | Examination | US6552807 | by applicant | US6552807 |