EP1876503 - Device, program, recording medium and method for preparing robot program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nihei, Ryo 4508-18 Kamiyoshida Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi 403-0005 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Tetsuaki 2-1-41 Shibusawakami Hadano-shi Kanagawa 259-1326 / JP | 03 /
Nishi, Hiroji 2101-9 Funatsu Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0301 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013016.6 | 03.07.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | JP20060184609 | 04.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006184609 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876503 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1876503 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876503 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4093 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
B25J9/1669 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39105 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40014 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40383 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40503 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40543 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/52] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Programm, Aufzeichnungsmittel und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Roboterprogramms | [2008/02] | English: | Device, program, recording medium and method for preparing robot program | [2008/02] | French: | Dispositif, programme, support d'enregistrement et procédé pour la création d'un programme de robot | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1533087 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5513299 (TERASAKI HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - SWAMINATHAN A ET AL, "APE: AN EXPERIENCE-BASED ASSEMBLY SEQUENCE PLANNER FOR MECHANICAL ASSEMBLIES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. NAGOYA,JAPAN, MAY 21 - 27, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950521), ISBN 978-0-7803-1966-0, pages 1278 - 1283, XP000701568 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1995.525456 | by applicant | JPH0659720 | JPH10187223 | EP1533087 |