EP1838003 - Wireless base station apparatus and wireless communication control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimasa, Imamura c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Akihito, Hanaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Hiroyuki, Ishii c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Masafumi, Usuda c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
Yoshimasa, Imamura NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Akihito, Hanaki NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Hiroyuki, Ishii NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Masafumi, Usuda NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07013051.3 | 27.04.2005 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | JP20040136662 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004136662 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1838003 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1838003 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838003 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04L1/00, H04W4/18, H04W28/16 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
H04B1/1027 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | H04B1/10, H04L1/00, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/39] | Title | German: | Drahtlose Basisstationsvorrichtung und drahtloses Kommunikationssteuerungsverfahren | [2007/39] | English: | Wireless base station apparatus and wireless communication control method | [2007/39] | French: | Appareil de station de base sans fil et procédé de contrôle de communication sans fil | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05252617.5 / EP1592139 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003188855 ; | [A]US5828695 (WEBB WILLIAM TIMOTHY [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 15 - line 18 ** column 3, line 24 - line 26 *; | [A]US2003045307 (ARVIV ELI [IL], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0040] , [0057] - [0062]; figure 7 *; | [A]WO03094565 (DSPC TECH LTD [IL]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 2 *; | [PA]EP1513282 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0053] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003188855 A 20030704 (NEC MOBILING LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |