EP1878844 - Single-layered web beam for a drywall suspended ceiling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worthington Armstrong Venture Suite 200, 9 Old Lincoln Highway Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Platt, William J. 3000 Franciscan Way Aston, PA 19014 / US | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2008/03] | Application number, filing date | 07013143.8 | 29.06.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | US20060481374 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: US 481374 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1878844 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1878844 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/06 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
E04B9/068 (EP,US);
B21D47/01 (EP,US);
E04B9/067 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49634 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Einschicht-träger für eine abgehängte Decke | [2008/03] | English: | Single-layered web beam for a drywall suspended ceiling | [2008/03] | French: | Poutre de bande monocouche pour plafond suspendu à cloison sèche | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2065378 (KLING FRED E) [Y] 1-4* column 2, line 10 - line 13; figure - *; | [Y]US3252399 (OLSON KERN C) [Y] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US3294428 (LICKLITER ROBERT P, et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 12 - line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4713919 (PLATT WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 1 - line 50; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE29801562U (TEGOMETALL INT AG [CH]) [Y] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 1 *; | [Y]WO0034599 (ERICSSON ROGER [SE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, line 21 - line 23 *; | [A]EP1338714 (WORTHINGTON ARMSTRONG VENTURE [US]) [A] 2,4 * paragraph [0036]; figure 2 *; | [DA]US6722098 (PLATT WILLIAM J [US]) [DA] 1,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE29801562U | WO0034599 |