EP1887018 - Vinyl ester copolymer dispersions, method for their manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): PL | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 111 61476 Kronberg/Ts. / DE | [2016/03] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 111 61476 Kronberg/Ts. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Harmin, Dr. Im Birkenfeld 2 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Faust, Hans Uwe Im Kohlruß 5 65835 Liederbach / DE | 03 /
Schäfer, Martin, Dr. Löschweiler Weg 10 76829 Landau i.d. Pfalz / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim, et al Mannheimer Straße 97 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2012/09] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013387.1 | 09.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20061037317 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037317 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887018 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1887018 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887018 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1887018 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F218/08, C09J131/04, C08L31/04 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C08F218/08 (EP,US);
C08L29/06 (EP,US);
C09J131/04 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L31/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L29/06, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C09J131/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vinylestercopolymer-Dispersionen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [2008/07] | English: | Vinyl ester copolymer dispersions, method for their manufacture and use | [2008/07] | French: | Dispersions de copolymères de vinylester, leur procédé de fabrication et d'utilisation | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2012
17.03.2015
WITHDRAWN Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Stationsstraat 77 3811 MH Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine, et al, et al Akzo Nobel Intellectual Property Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | 02
29.11.2012
20.12.2013
WITHDRAWN Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Schuderer, Michael, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2012
10.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Stationsstraat 77 3811 MH Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine, et al, et al Akzo Nobel Intellectual Property Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
02
29.11.2012
20.12.2013
WITHDRAWN Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Schuderer, Michael, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2012
WITHDRAWN Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Stationsstraat 77 3811 MH Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine, et al, et al Akzo Nobel Intellectual Property Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
02
29.11.2012
WITHDRAWN Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Schuderer, Michael, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | 22.01.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.07.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.06.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.12.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 09.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | SE | 10.07.2013 | AT | 09.07.2015 | FI | 09.07.2015 | IT | 09.07.2015 | TR | 09.07.2015 | HU | 10.07.2015 | [2019/10] |
Former [2017/46] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
AT | 09.07.2015 | ||
FI | 09.07.2015 | ||
IT | 09.07.2015 | ||
PL | 09.07.2015 | ||
TR | 09.07.2015 | ||
HU | 10.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
AT | 09.07.2015 | ||
FI | 09.07.2015 | ||
IT | 09.07.2015 | ||
PL | 09.07.2015 | ||
HU | 10.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
AT | 09.07.2015 | ||
FI | 09.07.2015 | ||
IT | 09.07.2015 | ||
HU | 10.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 09.07.2015 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0050548 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * page 1, line 21 - line 23 * * page 1, line 29 - line 31 * * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 10 - line 16 * * page 5, line 13 - line 16 * * page 6, line 32 - line 37 * * example 11 *; | [Y]EP1510529 (CELANESE EMULSIONS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-21* paragraphs [0003] , [0034] , [0037] , [0058] , [0059] , [0091] * | Opposition | EP0279384 | US4921898 | US5070134 | EP0761697 | US5679735 | US5747578 | US6063858 | EP1153979 | US2002045692 | US2003164478 | US2004048961 | WO2005047204 | - Broschüre "The World of Emulsions", veröffentlicht im September 1999 | - Technical Data Sheet Mowilith DM 132, veröffentlicht im März 2006 | - Messprotokoll zur Partikelgrößenmessung von Mowilith DM 132, datiert mit 05.12.2001 | - Versuchsbericht zur Vergleichbarkeit der Messung von Partikelgrößen | - Messprotokoll zur Partikelgrößenmessung von Mowilith DM 132, erhalten von der Firma Gludan am 03.12.2004, datiert mit 27.10.2011 | - Prüfungsnotiz zur Vollanalyse von Airflex 7200 der Fa. APCI, datiert mit 05.09.1996 | - Technical Data Sheet Airflex 7200 Emulsion, datiert mit 2001 | - Messprotokoll zur Partikelgrößenmessung Beispiel 1 von D3 | - Messprotokoll zur Partikelgrößenmessung Beispiel 2 von D3 | - Broschüre "Airvol Polyvinyl Alcohol", veröffentlicht 1998 | - Product Data Sheet IGEPAL CO-887, veröffentlicht Februar 2009 | - Messprotokoll zur Partikelgrößenmessung Beispiel 1, Run 8 von D4 | - Zusammenfassung der Messungen zur Bestimmung der Fließgrenze | - Vortrag "Influence of Emulsion Polymer Design on High Speed Liquid Adhesive, 10.2005 | - Übersicht der Vorträge bei ASC Fall 2005 Convention and Exposition, 9-12.10.2005 |