EP1881721 - Hand over control system, mobile communication system and hand over control method for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takai, Kenichi NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013403.6 | 09.07.2007 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | JP20060196302 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006196302 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881721 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Steuerung der Weiterreichung, mobiles Kommunikationssystem und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Weiterreichung zur Verwendung damit | [2008/04] | English: | Hand over control system, mobile communication system and hand over control method for use therewith | [2008/04] | French: | Système de commande de transfert, système de communication mobile et procédé de commande de transfert à utiliser avec celui-ci | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0504122 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO9319537 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO9731487 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [XY]EP1507422 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | EP0504122 | EP1507422 |