EP1887287 - Air conditioner having air filtering unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagae, Koji 5-14-3, Asahi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0514 / JP | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013618.9 | 11.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | JP20060209443 | 01.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006209443 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887287 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1887287 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/16 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
F24F1/0047 (EP,US);
F24F8/125 (EP,KR,US);
A61L9/015 (KR);
F24F1/0063 (EP,US);
F24F1/0071 (KR);
F24F1/0073 (EP,US);
F24F1/0087 (EP,US);
F24F13/28 (KR);
F24F6/04 (KR);
F24F8/10 (EP,US);
F24F8/117 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, HU, IT, NL [2010/15] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage mit Luftfiltereinheit | [2008/07] | English: | Air conditioner having air filtering unit | [2008/07] | French: | Climatiseur équipé d'une unité de filtrage de l'air | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1015553 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 6 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]JP2000257913 (TECHNO RYOWA LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]WO0248617 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 8* abstract *; | [X]JP2002181358 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]US2005072308 (AOYAGI KOHEI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0034] - [0042]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005126393 (CHEN YUNG-DAR [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figure 4 * |