EP1886899 - Electric power steering apparatus equipped with a mechanism for adjusting the tension of a transmission belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mando Corporation 343-1, Manho-ri Poseung-myeon Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Mando Corporation 343-1 Manho-ri Poseung-myeon Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggu-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Namgung, Joo 301, 943-9, Dangye-dong Wonju-si Gangwon-do / KR | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013660.1 | 12.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | KR20060075631 | 10.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060075631 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886899 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, F16H7/14 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B62D5/0424 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2096 (EP,US);
F16H7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/43] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Servolenkung mit einem Mechanismus zur Einstellung der Spannung eines Riemens | [2008/07] | English: | Electric power steering apparatus equipped with a mechanism for adjusting the tension of a transmission belt | [2008/07] | French: | Direction assistée électrique équipée d'un mécanisme de réglage de la tension d'une courroie de transmission | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005079939 (SIMMONS STANLEY R [US]) [Y] 5,6 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US2005133297 (CHIKARAISHI KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1-4,7 * paragraphs [0098] , [0099]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]US2005247514 (HEITZER DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-4,7* paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JP2005349862 (SHOWA CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JP2006027577 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1792804 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [PX] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document * |