EP1843141 - Methods and apparatus for determining the presence or absence of a fluid leak [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Waters Investments Limited 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luongo, Joseph A. 7 Saddle Way Walpole MA 02081 / US | 02 /
Ciavarini, Steven J. 27 Rome Avenue Bellingham MA 02019 / US | 03 /
Tacconi, Robert Q. 142 South Street Medfield MA 02052 / US | 04 /
Rubino, Frank A. 186 Jefferson Street North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 05 /
Dumas, Robert J. 2 Picadilly Street Upton, MA 01568 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
Luongo, Joseph A. 7 Saddle Way Walpole MA 02081 / US | ||
02 /
Ciavarini, Steven J. 27 Rome Avenue Bellingham MA 02019 / US | |||
03 /
Tacconi, Robert Q. 142 South Street Medfield MA 02052 / US | |||
04 /
Rubino, Frank A. 186 Jefferson Streeet North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | |||
05 /
Dumas, Robert J. 2 Picadilly Street Upton, MA 01568 / US | |||
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Luongo, Joseph A. 7 Saddle Way Walpole MA 02081 / US | ||
02 /
Ciavarini, Steven J. 27 Rome Avenue Bellingham MA 02019 / US | |||
03 /
Tacconi, Robert Q. 142 South Street Medfield MA 02052 / US | |||
04 /
Rubino, Frank A. 243 Central Street Apt. 4 Milford MA 01757 / US | |||
05 /
Dumas, Robert J. 2 Picadilly Street Upton, MA 01568 / US | |||
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
Luongo, Joseph A. 7 Saddle Way Walpole MA 02081 / US | ||
02 /
Ciavarini, Steven J. 27 Rome Avenue Bellingham MA 02019 / US | |||
03 /
Tacconi, Robert Q. 142 South Street Medfield MA 02052 / US | |||
04 /
Rubino, Frank A. 243 Central Street Apt. 4 Milford MA 01757 / US | |||
05 /
Dumas, Robert J. 8 Bradish Farm Road Upton, MA 01568 / US | |||
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
Luongo, Joseph A. 7 Saddle Way Walpole MA 02081 / US | ||
02 /
Ciavarini, Steven J. 27 Rome Avenue Bellingham MA 02019 / US | |||
03 /
Tacconi, Robert Q. 142 South Street Medfield MA 02052 / US | |||
04 /
Rubino, Frank A. 243 Central Street Apt. 4 Milford MA 01757 / US | |||
05 /
Dumas, Robert J. 8 Bradish Farm Road Upton MA 01568 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013891.2 | 01.03.2002 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | US20010272934P | 02.03.2001 Original published format: US 272934 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843141 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1843141 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843141 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/26, G01M3/20, G01M3/00, F04B51/00, G08B21/00, F04B1/04, F04B43/00, F04B49/06 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
F04B51/00 (EP);
G01M3/26 (EP);
F04B2201/0208 (EP);
F04B2205/05 (EP);
G01N2030/326 (EP);
G01N30/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Vorliegens oder Nichtvorliegens eines Flüssigkeitslecks | [2007/41] | English: | Methods and apparatus for determining the presence or absence of a fluid leak | [2007/41] | French: | Procédés et appareil pour déterminer la présence ou l'absence d'une fuite de liquide | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02717535.5 / EP1364194 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4927411 (PASTRONE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 15, line 3 - column 18, line 48; figure 25 *; | [A]US5336053 (WYNKOOP RICHARD D [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]NL1006954C (OMVE NETHERLANDS B V [NL]) [A] 1-11* abstract * | by applicant | US4927411 | US5336053 |