EP1862497 - Polymer matrix electroluminescent materials and devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company Limited 27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Sumation Co., Ltd. 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marrocco, Matthew L. 9892-1 Arrow Route Rancho Cucamonga CA 91730 / US | 02 /
Motamedi, Farshad J. 2341 Ohio Drive Claremont California 91711 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
Marrocco, Matthew L. 9892-1 Arrow Route Rancho Cucamonga CA 91730 / US | ||
02 /
Motamedi, Farshad J. 1381 North Birchnell Avenue San Dimas CA 91773 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014220.3 | 12.06.2001 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | US20000211108 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: US 211108 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862497 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1862497 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862497 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/10, C08G61/12, C08G73/22, C08K3/24, C08L65/00, C08L79/04, H05B33/14, C09K11/06, C08G73/18, H01L51/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
C08G61/10 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C08G61/12 (EP,US);
C08G61/122 (EP,US);
C08G61/124 (EP,US);
C08G61/125 (EP,US);
C08G61/126 (EP,US);
C08G73/18 (EP,US);
C08G73/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,US);
C08L79/04 (EP,US);
C09D165/00 (US);
C09D165/02 (US);
C09D5/22 (EP,US);
C09D5/24 (US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K30/865 (US);
H10K85/111 (EP,US);
H10K85/114 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
C08G2261/12 (US);
C08G2261/1523 (US);
C08G2261/312 (US);
C08G2261/52 (US);
C08G2261/95 (US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1425 (US);
C09K2211/145 (US);
C09K2211/1466 (EP,US);
C09K2211/182 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K2102/102 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/125 (EP,US);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/16 (US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K50/828 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | C08K3/08, C08K3/10, H01J1/62, H01L33/00, H01L51/30, C09K11/06, C08G61/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszente Materialien und Vorrichtungen für eine Polymermatrix | [2007/49] | English: | Polymer matrix electroluminescent materials and devices | [2007/49] | French: | Matériaux et dispositifs électroluminescents à matrice de polymère | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01948324.7 / EP1297060 | Divisional application(s) | EP10011685.4 / EP2272904 | EP10011686.2 / EP2272905 | EP10011687.0 / EP2272906 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010948324) is 19.05.2005 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 16.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11273863 ; | [X]US5442021 (HEILIGER LUDGER [DE]) [X] 13-26 * column 6, line 35 - line 36 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0773248 (MAXDEM INC [US]) [A] 38-41 * claims 1,28,30 * * page 12, column 48 - column 50 *; | [X]US5756224 (BOERNER HERBERT F DR [DE], et al) [X] 38 * claims 4,11,12 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 51 *; | [X]US5949188 (LEISING GUENTHER [AT], et al) [X] 13-15,17-21,27,28,30-37 * column 2, line 20 - line 24 * * column 2, line 32 - line 34 * * column 3, line 24 - line 34 * * figures 2,4 * * claims 9,13 *; | [A]EP0949695 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,2,7,11,12,14,16 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] ** page 36, paragraph 80 - page 37, paragraph 81 *; | [E]EP1122793 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-9 * claims 3,10 * * page 4, paragraph 28 - paragraph 29 * * page 6, paragraph 60 *; | [E]EP1138746 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-9 * p.8 Formula 37, p.10 Formula 41, p.11 Formula 43, p.13 Formula 9 * * page 30, paragraph 159 - page 31, paragraph 161 *; | [E]US2003091862 (TOKITO SHIZUO [JP], et al) [E] 1-9 * claim 30 * * paragraph [0137] * * page 14 - page 15; examples 1-2/1-3 *; | [E]WO03067679 (ELAM T LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-9 * claims 1,4,7,12,20-33 *; | [E]DE10224617 (STARCK H C GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-9 * claims 1,3-5,7,9 *; | [E]US2007059551 (YAMAZAKI KAZUKI [JP]) [E] 1-9 * claims 1,7,14 *; | [Y] - SALBECK J, "Electroluminescence with organic compounds", BERICHTE DER BUNSEN-GESELLSCHAFT FUR PHYSIKALISCHE CHEMIE, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (199610), vol. 100, no. 10, ISSN 0005-9021, pages 1667 - 1677, XP002103244 [Y] 10-12 * page 1674, column R - page 1675, column L; figure 9; compound 21 * * page 1673, column R, paragraph LAST * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 54, Database accession no. 1999-625013, XP002319112 & JPH11273863 A 19991008 (TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 10-12 * abstract * | [AP] - W. ZHU, Y. MO, M. YUAN. W.YANG, Y. CAO, "Highly efficient electrophosphorescent devices based on conjugated polymers doped with iridium complexes", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 80, no. 12, (20020325), pages 2045 - 2047, URL: http://www2.scut.edu.cn/academician/xzzq/cy/2.pdf, XP002456900 [AP] 1-9 * page 2045, column LEFT * * page 2047, column RIGHT * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1461418 |