EP1882455 - Medical instrument for cutting tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berberich, Sascha In Wöhrden 18 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014256.7 | 20.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | DE20061034756 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006034756 | [2008/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1882455 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1882455 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, // A61M1/00, A61B17/16 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/1633 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Medizinisches Instrument zum Schneiden von Gewebe | [2008/05] | English: | Medical instrument for cutting tissue | [2008/05] | French: | Instrument médical destiné à couper des tissus | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 18.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IE | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | MT | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | ES | 29.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | AT | 20.07.2009 | LU | 20.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 27.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.07.2009 | ||
LU | 20.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.07.2009 | ||
LU | 20.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
AT | 20.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4811734 (MCGURK-BURLESON ERIN [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5741287 (ALDEN DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7-9 * abstract * * column 5, lines 1-17 *; | [A]US6610059 (WEST JR HUGH S [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006011119 (DA ROLD ORLANDO [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,5-9 * abstract * | by applicant | US5489291 |