EP1841245 - Method and system for mobile communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi@c/o Intellectual Proprerty Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Akiko@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Kusinose, Kenya@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 08 /
Sato, Takaaki@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 11 /
Hamajima, Takuya@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 12 /
Hata, Masafumi@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide@c/o Intellectual Property Department@NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/13] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi c/o Intellectual Proprerty Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusinose, Kenya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi c/o Intellectual Proprerty Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumanu c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusinose, Kenya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumanu c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusinose, Kenya c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., IPR Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, nagatacho-2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi 18-2-101 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Motsumaru 18-2-105 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko Green Gables C-101 12-14 Tokuyoshi Higashi 1-chome Kokura Minami-ku Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 803-0277 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusunose, Kenya 6-1-302 Hikarinooka Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro 18-2-304 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke 6-1-507 Hirarinooka Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko 1-22-3-302 Kosugaya Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-0007 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki 18-4-704 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro Adorabure Kuriki A-101 1-35-3 Kuriki Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-0041 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki 18-2-603 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya 606 Marine Heim 1283-3 Tauraminato-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-0071 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi 3-301 Daikan Plaza City 1-8 Yasuura-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 238-0012 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka 202 Bell Light Nokendai 18-11 Nokendai-tori Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0053 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki 6-13-31 Okamura Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-0021 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi 18-4-304 Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide 20-1-201 Yoshimien 9-chome Sacki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5132 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2007/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014400.1 | 24.04.1998 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP19970123782 | 24.04.1997 Original published format: JP 12378297 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841245 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1841245 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1841245 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841245 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W40/02, // H04W72/04, H04W36/00, H04W88/06 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H04B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W12/02 (KR);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W36/30 (KR);
H04W52/04 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W88/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/09] | H04W72/02, // H04W72/04, H04W36/00, H04W88/06 | ||
Former IPC [2007/40] | H04Q7/24, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2015/09] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur mobilen Kommunikation | [2007/40] | English: | Method and system for mobile communications | [2007/40] | French: | Procédé et système de communication mobile | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 30.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98917680.5 / EP0978958 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980917680) is 08.10.2003 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/47] | SE | 29.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4284848 (FROST EDWARD G) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2288301 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5471670 (HESS GARRY C [US], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]US5475864 (HAMABE KOJIRO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9626621 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9627244 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9700590 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |