EP1886549 - Apparatus for controlling the displacement of a self-propelling ground-based automatic vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernini, Fabrizio Via della Pace, 3 52020 Mercatale Valdarno / IT | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Baroni, Matteo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Baroni, Matteo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/07] | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via dei Rustici, 5 50122 Firenze FI / IT | Application number, filing date | 07014646.9 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | IT2006FI00202 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: IT FI20060202 | [2008/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886549 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886549 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/00 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
A01D34/008 (EP);
G05D1/0265 (EP);
G05D1/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Verschiebung eines selbstgetriebenen, erdgebundenen Automatikfahrzeugs | [2008/07] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the displacement of a self-propelling ground-based automatic vehicle | [2008/07] | French: | Appareil pour commander le déplacement d'un véhicule terrestre autopropulsé automatique | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 14.06.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 20.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2007 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | GB | 26.07.2012 | IE | 26.07.2012 | LU | 26.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
IE | 26.07.2012 | ||
LU | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
IE | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
IE | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
IE | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002140393 (PELESS EHUD [IL], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0078] , [0080] - [0082] - [0096] - [0098] *; | [X]US2002156556 (RUFFNER BRYAN J [US]) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0026] , [0030] , [0090] * | Examination | EP1369017 | by applicant | FI151 | US2002140393 |