EP1886728 - Electronic metering device for metering liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPPENDORF AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molitor, Peter Wilstedterstrasse 112 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | 02 /
Andres, Karl-Friedrich Amselweg 33 22941 Bargteheide / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Peter Marlesgrube 73 23552 Lübeck / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014653.5 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20061037213 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037213 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886728 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1886728 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886728 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
B01L3/0227 (EP,US);
B01L2200/14 (EP,US);
B01L2300/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/16] |
Former [2008/44] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Dosiervorrichtung zum Dosieren von Flüssigkeiten | [2008/07] | English: | Electronic metering device for metering liquids | [2008/07] | French: | Dispositif de dosage électronique destiné au dosage de liquides | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2015 | 15.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10013208.3 / EP2292330 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.04.2016 | [2017/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9403222 (HABLEY MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 20, line 20 - page 21, line 2 *; | [XY]EP0864364 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-30 * column 5, line 28 - line 30; figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 31 - line 33 * * column 7, line 30 - line 53 * [Y] 6-9,12,6-9; | [XY]US2004099067 (CHEN TAI HO [TW], et al) [X] 1-5,11,13-30 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 6-9,12; | [A]WO2005052781 (GILSON SAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005079989 (THERMO ELECTRON OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-30 * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]US2005255006 (ROMAGUERA ANTONIO [DE]) [A] 1-30* figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE102004038962 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6-9,12 * figures 6-8 *; | [XY] - BRANDT GMBH + CO KG, "Transferpette electronic", ANNOUNCEMENT BRAND, BRAND, WERTHEIM, DE, (20030707), pages 1 - 33, XP002337207 [X] 1-5,10,11,13-30 * the whole document * [Y] 6-9,12 | Examination | EP0576967 | WO0051739 | WO0051738 | US6254832 | US2002005075 |