EP1883204 - Method and system for unified communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Wenhu Huawei Administration Bldg. Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129, Guangdong / CN | [2011/37] |
Former [2008/05] | 01 /
Zhang, Wenhu Huawei Administration Bldg. Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129, Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/05] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014720.2 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | CN20061099119 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: CN200610099119 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1883204 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1883204 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F3/048 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
G06F9/542 (EP,US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US);
G06F9/543 (EP,US);
H04M1/2478 (EP,US);
G06F2209/545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur vereinheitlichten Kommunikation | [2008/05] | English: | Method and system for unified communication | [2008/05] | French: | Procédé et système pour communications unifiées | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 06.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2007 | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | MT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 14.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0917038 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 1c * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0009] - [0013] - [0016] , [0017] , [0019] - [0021] - [0025] , [0028] *; | [X]US2005249346 (SCHNURR JEFFREY R [CA]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 6 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0021] - [0028] - [0032] - [0034] - [0040] , [0045] *; | [X]EP1601169 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0019] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] - [0041] * * figure 7 * | by applicant | EP0917038 | US2005249346 | EP1601169 |