EP1895008 - Isoprenoid biosynthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bacher, Adelbert Königsbergerstrasse 74 85748 Garching / DE | For all designated states Zenk, Meinhart H. 11 Alden Lane Saint Louis, MO 63141 / US | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bacher, Adelbert Königsbergerstr.74 85748 Garching / DE | 02 /
Zenk, Meinhart H. Donald Danforth Plant Science Center 975 North Warson Road St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | 03 /
Eisenreich, Wolfgang Prälat-Michael-Höck-Str.27 85354 Freising / DE | 04 /
Fellermeier, Monika Lierstr. 12b 80639 München / DE | 05 /
Fischer, Markus Ruppertstr.10 80337 München / DE | 06 /
Hecht, Stefan Ganghofer Str. 4a 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 07 /
Herz, Stefan Albrechtstr.32 80636 München / DE | 08 /
Kis, Klaus Beustweg 3 8032 Zürich / CH | 09 /
Lüttgen, Holger Nudower Dorfstrasse 35G 14558 Nuthetal OT Nudow / DE | 10 /
Rohdich, Felix Moosburger Str.16 85406 Zolling / DE | 11 /
Sagner, Silvia Hess Str.41 80798 München / DE | 12 /
Schuhr, Christoph A. Bertoldistr. 19 51065 Köln / DE | 13 /
Wungsintaweekul, Juraithip c/o Dep.of Pharmacognosy and Pharmaceutical Botany Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences Prince of Songkla University Hat Yai Songkhla, 90112 / TH | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Bacher, Adelbert Königsbergerstr.74 85748 Garching / DE | ||
02 /
Zenk, Meinhart H. Donald Danforth Plant Science Center 975 North Warson Road St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | |||
03 /
Eisenreich, Wolfgang Prälat-Michael-Höck-Str.27 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
Fellermeier, Monika Lierstr. 12b 80639 München / DE | |||
05 /
Fischer, Markus Ruppertstr.10 80337 München / DE | |||
06 /
Hecht, Stefan Ganghofer Str. 4a 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | |||
07 /
Herz, Stefan Albrechtstr.32 80636 München / DE | |||
08 /
Kis, Klaus Beustweg 3 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
09 /
Lüttgen, Holger Nudower Dorfstrasse 35G 14558 Nuthetal OT Nudow / DE | |||
10 /
Rohdich, Felix Moosburger Str.16 85406 Zolling / DE | |||
11 /
Sagner, Silvia Hess Str.41 80798 München / DE | |||
12 /
Schuhr, Chrisoph A. Bertoldistr. 19 51065 Köln / DE | |||
13 /
Wungsintaweekul, Juraithip c/o Dep.of Pharmacognosy and Pharmaceutical Botany Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences Prince of Songkla University Hat Yai Songkhla, 90112 / TH | |||
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
Bacher, Adelbert Königsbergerstr.74 85748 Garching / DE | ||
02 /
Zenk, Meinhart H. 660 South Euclid Avenue St. Louis, MO 63110 / DE | |||
03 /
Eisenreich, Wolfgang Prälat-Michael-Höck-Str.27 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
Fellermeier, Monika Lierstr. 12b 80639 München / DE | |||
05 /
Fischer, Markus Ruppertstr.10 80337 München / DE | |||
06 /
Hecht, Stefan Ganghofer Str. 4a 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | |||
07 /
Herz, Stefan Albrechtstr.32 80636 München / DE | |||
08 /
Kis, Klaus Beustweg 3 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
09 /
Lüttgen, Holger Nudower Dorfstrasse 35G 14558 Nuthetal OT Nudow / DE | |||
10 /
Rohdich, Felix Moosburger Str.16 85406 Zolling / DE | |||
11 /
Sagner, Silvia Hess Str.41 80798 München / DE | |||
12 /
Schuhr, Chrisoph A. Bertoldistr. 19 51065 Köln / DE | |||
13 /
Wungsintaweekul, Juraithip c/o Dep.of Pharmacognosy and Pharmaceutical Botany Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences Prince of Songkla University Hat Yai Songkhla, 90112 / TH | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014821.8 | 03.08.2000 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999136663 | 04.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19936663 | DE1999145175 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945175 | DE1999145174 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945174 | DE1999148887 | 11.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948887 | DE1999153309 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953309 | DE2000120996 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10020996 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1895008 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1895008 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N15/60, C12N9/12, C12N9/88, G01N33/68, A01N61/00, C12P23/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C12N9/1229 (EP);
C12N9/1205 (EP);
C12N9/88 (EP);
C12P23/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | C12N15/54, C12N15/60, C12N9/12, C12N9/88, C12P23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/10] | Title | German: | Biosynthese von Isoprenoid | [2008/10] | English: | Isoprenoid biosynthesis | [2008/10] | French: | Biosynthèse d'isoprenoïdes | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00949452.7 / EP1198575 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0841394 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-2,8,11,13 * SEQ ID NO: 528; page 28; claims 1-29 *; | [X]US5824873 (GRIERSON DONALD [GB], et al) [X] 4-5,9-10 * SEQ ID NOs: 1,2; column 5, line 46 - line 50; claims 1-16 *; | [A]WO9911757 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 25; figure 1; claims 1-18 *; | [X] - POST D A ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF THE HEMA-PRS REGION OF THE ESCHERICHIA COLI AND SALMONELLA TYPHIMURIUM CHROMOSOMES: IDENTIFICATION OF TWO OPEN READING FRAMES AND IMPLICATIONS FOR PRS EXPRESSION", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 139, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 259 - 266, XP000923112 [X] 4-5,11,13 * page 265, column 1; figures 1,3 * | [X] - BLATTNER F R ET AL, "THE COMPLETE GENOME SEQUENCE OF ESCHERICHIA COLI K-12", SCIENCE, (19970905), vol. 277, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1453 - 1462, XP002923023 [X] 1-13 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5331.1453 | [XP] - ROHDICH ET AL., "Cytidine 5'-triphosphate-dependent biosynthesis of isoprenoids: YgbP protein of Escherichia coli catalyzes the formation of 4-diphosphocytidyl-2-C-methylerythritol", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (19991012), vol. 96, no. 21, pages 11758 - 11763, XP002154080 [XP] 1-2,11,13 * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.21.11758 | [XP] - HERZ ET AL., "Biosynthesis of terpenoids: YgbB protein converts 4-diphosphocytidyl-2C-methyl-D-erythritol 2-phosphate to 2C-methyl-D-erythritol 2,4-cyclodiphosphate", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (20000314), vol. 97, no. 6, pages 2486 - 2490, XP002154081 [XP] 3,6-7,11,13 * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.040554697 | [XP] - LÜTTGEN ET AL., "Biosynthesis of terpenoids: YchB protein of Escherichia coli phosphorylates the 2-hydroxy group of 4-diphosphocytidyl-2C-methyl-D-erythritol", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (20000201), vol. 97, no. 3, pages 1062 - 1067, XP002154082 [XP] 4-5,11,13 * figures 1-3,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.3.1062 |