EP1884682 - Power transmission chain, method for manufacturing power transmission member of the power transmission chain, and power transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tada, Seiji c/o Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kamamoto, Shigeo c/o Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/06] | 01 /
Tada, Seiji c/o Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Kamamoto, Shigeo c/o Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015273.1 | 03.08.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | JP20060213881 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006213881 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884682 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1884682 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884682 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP,US);
F16H9/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/13] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Treibkette, Herstellungsverfahren eines Treibelements der Treibkette und Antriebsvorrichtung | [2008/06] | English: | Power transmission chain, method for manufacturing power transmission member of the power transmission chain, and power transmission device | [2008/06] | French: | Chaîne de transmission , procédé pour la fabrication d'un élément de transmission de la chaîne de transmission et dispositif de transmission | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 23.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10003131 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1-4,7,8(a)-(c) * * column 2, line 2 - line 16 * * column 3, line 19 - line 34 * * column 4, line 51 - line 56 * * column 5, line 1 - line 20 * [Y] 4; | [Y]WO2005045280 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | EP1698800 [ ] (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [ ] * figure 7 * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 8 * * page 6, paragraph 40 - paragraph 42 * * claim 1 *; | [XL]WO2006043605 (JTEKT CORP [JP], et al) [XL] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | EP1810783 [ ] (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [ ] * figures 1,2(a),(b),3 * * sentence 13, paragraph 5 - sentence 20, paragraph 8 *; | [X]EP1443242 (NTRK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1,3,12 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0008] *; | [XA]JP2005308108 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * [A] 5; | [X]JPS6125761 (NISHIMURA MOTOI) [X] 5 * abstract *; | [X]JPS5783353 (NISSHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US4795406 (DITTRICH OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005045280 |