EP1911639 - Motor vehicle key [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Ian 4123 Alpine Road 94028 Portola Valley, CA / US | 02 /
Rosario, Daniel 1036 West Cliff Drive 95060 Santa Cruz, CA / US | 03 /
Chen, Pao Hsu 205 Metropolitan Dr. 95035 Milpitas, CA / US | 04 /
Srinivasan, Venkat 395, Ano Nueve Ave, 710 94085 Sunnyvale, CA / US | 05 /
Stoschek, Arne 609 Grer Road 94303 Palo Alto / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Kiriczi, Sven Bernhard Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Patentanwälte, München Mühlthaler Strasse 91c 81475 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Kiriczi, Sven Bernhard Schneiders & Behrendt Mühlthaler Strasse 91d 81475 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015330.9 | 04.08.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | US20060850491P | 10.10.2006 Original published format: US 850491 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911639 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, E05B19/00, E05B19/22, G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, G02F1/167, G07C9/00, G09G3/34 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
E05B19/26 (EP,US);
B60R25/2009 (EP,US);
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
E05B19/22 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
B60R2325/202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugschlüssel | [2008/16] | English: | Motor vehicle key | [2008/16] | French: | Clé de véhicule automobile | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 30.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/51] | 29.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5731859 (KULKARNI SUDHAKAR N [US]) [Y] 1 * abstract ** column 1, line 13 - line 16 *; | [Y]DE29911232U (ADOLPH MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [Y]EP1361324 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005215286 (BRASS RICHARD I [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0026] , [0041] - [0043]; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]US2006023296 (WHITESIDES THOMAS H [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0020] , [0039] *; | [Y]EP1640959 (IDC LLC [US]) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0026]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1647941 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0013] - [0044] - [0062] , [0065] - [0067]; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | US5731859 | DE29911232U | EP1361324 | US2005215286 | US2006023296 | EP1640959 | EP1674941 |