EP1886975 - Neutraliser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mommertz Wasser- und Wärmetechnik GmbH Lenbachstrasse 16 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mommertz, Peter Hofgartenweg 4 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015516.3 | 07.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20061037502 | 10.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037502 | DE20061051190 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006051190 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886975 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/66, F24H8/00 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C02F1/66 (EP);
F24H8/006 (EP);
C02F2103/18 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Neutralisator | [2008/07] | English: | Neutraliser | [2008/07] | French: | Agent neutralisant | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7703975U (THEODOR CHRIST AG, AESCH) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US4309947 (KETTERER EDWARD A) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0162195 (KRAUSE WILLIBALD [DE]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0277300 (BOMMER ROLF) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2006102617 (NORITZ CORP) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2006112688 (NORITZ CORP) [X] 1-20 * figure - *; | [T]DE102006014601 (GRUENBECK JOSEF WASSERAUFB [DE]) [T] * the whole document * |