EP2022951 - Method for manufacturing a turbine casing and turbine casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dallinger, Heinz Zehntweg 139 45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Wieghardt, Kai, Dr. Egellstrasse 3 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2009/07] | Application number, filing date | 07015627.8 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022951 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/26 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
F01D25/26 (EP,US);
B22D25/00 (US);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US);
F05D2230/30 (EP,US);
F05D2230/31 (EP,US);
F05D2230/40 (EP,US);
F05D2240/14 (EP,US);
F05D2260/94 (EP,US);
F05D2260/941 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/42] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Turbinengehäuses sowie Turbinengehäuse | [2009/07] | English: | Method for manufacturing a turbine casing and turbine casing | [2009/07] | French: | Procédé destiné à la fabrication d'un boîtier de turbine et boîtier de turbine | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/05] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1559872 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,10,11* paragraph [0015] *; | [DX]EP1586394 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,12,13,18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0014] *; | [X]EP1734145 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,19,20 * paragraph [0046] * * claims 6,24 * |