EP1860079 - Anisotropically-shaped powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/48] | Grain oriented ceramics and a production process thereof, as well as an anisotropically-shaped powder and a production process thereof | ||
[2011/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-1192 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takao, Hisaaki, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Yasuyoshi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | 03 /
Tani, Toshihiko, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | [2012/02] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Takao, Hisaaki, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
Saito, Yasuyoshi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | |||
03 /
Tani, Toshihiko, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 480-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015645.0 | 23.04.2002 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010124225 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124225 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860079 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860079 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1860079 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, C04B35/495, C01G33/00, C01G35/00, C01G30/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C01G29/006 (EP,US);
C01G33/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
H10N30/853 (EP,US);
C01P2002/20 (EP,US);
C01P2002/34 (EP,US);
C01P2002/70 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3255 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3294 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3298 (EP,US);
C04B2235/444 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5292 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5296 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6025 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] | Title | German: | Anisotrop geformtes Pulver | [2011/39] | English: | Anisotropically-shaped powder | [2011/39] | French: | Poudre de forme anisotrope | [2011/39] |
Former [2007/48] | Kornorientierte Keramik und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren sowie anisotrop geformtes Pulver und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2007/48] | Grain oriented ceramics and a production process thereof, as well as an anisotropically-shaped powder and a production process thereof | ||
Former [2007/48] | Céramique à grains orientés et son procédé de fabrication, ainsi que poudre de forme anisotrope et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 18.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2011 | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02009059.3 / EP1253121 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020009059) is 21.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05148656 ; | JPH05148656 [ ]; | [XA]EP0714850 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * example 4 * [A] 3,4; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 28, Database accession no. 1993-224612, XP002286191 & JPH05148656 A 19930615 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - EGERTON L ET AL, "Isostatically hot-pressed sodium-potassium niobate transducer material for ultrasonic devices", AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (196812), vol. 47, no. 12, ISSN 0002-7812, pages 1151 - 1156, XP002268091 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - JAEGER R E ET AL, HOT PRESSING OF POTASSIUM-SODIUM NIOBATES, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, PAGE(S) 209-213, (196205), ISSN 0002-7820, XP001179221 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - Gmelins Handbuch der anorganischen Chemie, Antimon B, CLAUSTHAL-ZELLERFELD GMELIN VERLAG GMBH, (1949), XP002285305 [A] * page 388 - page 389 * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930929), vol. 0175, no. 40, Database accession no. (C - 1115), & JP05148656 A 19930615 (MURATA MFG CO LTD; others: 01) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05148656 | EP0714850 | - EGERTON ET AL., "Isostatically hot pressed sodium-potassium niobate transducer material for ultrasonic devices", AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, (196812), vol. 47, no. 12, pages 1151 - 1156 | - JAEGER ET AL., "Hot pressing of potassium-sodium niobates", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (196205), pages 209 - 213 | - GMELINS, HANDBUCH DER ANORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, (1949), pages 388 - 389 |