EP1903758 - Mobile communication terminal and method for providing wait screen thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jong, In Won c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin Yong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Baek, Sung Hwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jeon, Hee Kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Hong, Nho Kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Youn, Su Jung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Birchenough, Lewis, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07015648.4 | 08.08.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | KR20060092753 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060092753 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903758 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903758 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/048 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04M1/72442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/47] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationsendgerät und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung eines Wartebildschirms dafür | [2008/13] | English: | Mobile communication terminal and method for providing wait screen thereof | [2008/13] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile et procédé pour la fourniture de son écran d'attente | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.05.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9616395 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 17,20-22 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0831629 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [KR]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 38 - line 41 * * page 7, line 31 - line 33 * * page 8, line 11 - line 16 * * claims 1,18-20 * * figures 4A-4C *; | [Y]EP1130886 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 17-22 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 8C-8F *; | [A]US2002054158 (ASAMI AKIKO [JP]) [A] 17,22 * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0169] ** figures 11,13 *; | [A]GB2373977 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 11 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2003002391 (BIGGS KEVIN [CA]) [A] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2004075700 (LIU CATHERINE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2004168565 (NAGAO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 17-22 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]WO2005003954 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 13 * * page 7, line 24 - line 36; figures 2-5 * |