EP1887156 - Support plate device for a prefabricated structural part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MWT Micro Wood Technology GmbH & Co KEG Glan 8 9560 Feldkirchen / AT | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauli, Gerhard Josef Klaus Strasse 4 9560 Feldkirchen / AT | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Ofner, Clemens, et al Dr. Lindmayr, Dr.Bauer, Dr. Secklehner Rechtsanwalts-OEG Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2008/07] | Application number, filing date | 07015737.5 | 10.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | AT20060000601U | 10.08.2006 Original published format: AT 60106 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2008/26] | AT20060060120U | 10.08.2006 | |
Former [2008/07] | AT20060000601 | 10.08.2006 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887156 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1887156 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/70 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
E04B2/701 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Extension states | AL | 06.08.2008 | BA | 06.08.2008 | HR | 06.08.2008 | MK | 06.08.2008 | RS | 06.08.2008 | Title | German: | Auflagevorrichtung für einen Fertigbauteil | [2008/07] | English: | Support plate device for a prefabricated structural part | [2008/07] | French: | Dispositif de support pour un préfabriqué | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0214378 (MEDICAL & SCIENT STRUCTUR [GB]) [A] 1,8* figure 8 *; | [X]WO2004085757 (GRANDI RUGGERO [IT], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 17 - line 19; figure 8 * | by applicant | WO2004085757 |