EP1914060 - Device for extruding hollow rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INOEX GmbH Borweg 27 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diekhaus, Brigitte Geierweg 8 33659 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Schmuhl, Jörg, Dr. Heideweg 24 15711 Königs Wusterhausen / DE | 03 /
Klose, Reinhard Wilhelm-Raabe-Weg 18 31737 Rinteln / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Seewald, Jürgen Theaterstrasse 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 07015836.5 | 11.08.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | DE20061049660 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049660 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1914060 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1914060 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914060 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/90, B29C47/92, B29C47/22, // B29C47/88 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B29C48/908 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/325 (EP,US);
B29C48/903 (EP,US);
B29C48/907 (EP,US);
B29C48/916 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92123 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92152 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92428 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92609 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92619 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92904 (EP,US);
B29C48/904 (EP,US);
B29C48/905 (EP,US);
B29C48/9115 (EP,US);
B29C48/913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Extrudieren von Hohlsträngen | [2008/17] | English: | Device for extruding hollow rods | [2008/17] | French: | Dispositif destiné à extruder des tiges creuses | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | FI | 11.08.2010 | IE | 11.08.2010 | LT | 11.08.2010 | LU | 11.08.2010 | LV | 11.08.2010 | MT | 11.08.2010 | PL | 11.08.2010 | RO | 11.08.2010 | SI | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | FR | 11.10.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | IS | 11.12.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | HU | 12.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LU | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
MT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 11.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
HU | 12.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
MT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 11.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
HU | 12.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
MT | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 11.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 11.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 11.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LT | 11.08.2010 | ||
LV | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
IS | 11.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0326521 (UBE NITTO KASEI CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH04119818 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE4135339 (CONPRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 1; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE10021728 (GREINER EXTRUSIONSTECHNIK GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 10 - column 6, line 17; figures 2,4 *; | [A]JP2002264202 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004264758 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A] - COLVIN R, "OPPORTUNITIES ABOUND IN WATER PIPE REPLACEMENT", MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL, MCGRAW-HILL,INC. LAUSANNE, CH, (19971101), vol. 27, no. 11, ISSN 0026-8283, page 64/65,67, XP000731820 [A] 1-10 * page 67; figure . * | by applicant | JPH04119818 | DE10021728 | EP1115551 | DE20219089U | DE202004019566U |