EP1900453 - Mould wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/25] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fehlemann, Gereon Kreuzbergstrasse 82 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Girgensohn, Albrecht, Dr. Weststrasse 15 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Klüppel, Walter, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015921.5 | 14.08.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | DE20061041737 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041737 | DE20071001931 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007001931 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900453 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900453 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/055 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B22D11/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Kokillenwand | [2008/12] | English: | Mould wall | [2008/12] | French: | Paroi de lingotière | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5207266 (NAKASHIMA KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003136204 (MISHIMA KOSAN CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract *; | [X]JPH02200353 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | US5207266 | JP2003136204 | JPH02200353 |