EP1901366 - Electric storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Hybrid and Recycling GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | [2009/52] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states VARTA Automotive Systems GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bechthold, Dieter Chattenweg 28 61118 Bad Vibel / DE | 02 /
Pelz, Kai Bohnstrasse 23 31832 Springe / DE | 03 /
Joswig, Ralf Ahornring 22 29690 Buchholz (Aller) / DE | 04 /
Wiegmann, Martin Bockhoper Strasse 25 27246 Borstel / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016097.3 | 16.08.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | DE20061041326 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041326 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901366 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901366 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/24 (EP,US);
H01M50/242 (EP,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Elektrische Speicherbatterie | [2008/12] | English: | Electric storage battery | [2008/12] | French: | Batterie de rechange électrique | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2007 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | IE | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE930731 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1-3,8 * pages 1-3; figure 1 *; | [A]US2939901 (SCHULTZ CLARENCE H) [A] 1,2,8 * column 1; figure 2 *; | [A]US3056850 (RAUSKE WOLDEMAR C, et al) [A] 1,8* page 4, column 4; figure 2.3 *; | [A]US2001010878 (NAKANISHI NAOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005260488 (ZHOU SHIJIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0029]; figure 6 * | Examination | JP2001268717 |