EP2026519 - Predistortion for a space-time block coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Deutschland GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications Technology GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Peter Siegstrasse 27 47051 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Bruck, Guido Horst Poststrasse 87 46562 Voerde / DE | 03 /
Scholand, Tobias Bachstrasse 27 45468 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | 04 /
Spiegel, Christoph Scheffelstrasse 44 46045 Oberhausen / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016196.3 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026519 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04L1/06 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L1/0662 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Vorverzerrung für eine Raum-Zeit-Block-Kodierung | [2009/08] | English: | Predistortion for a space-time block coding | [2009/08] | French: | Prédistorsion pour un encodage de bloc espace-temps | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1605653 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]EP1628414 (IOSPAN WIRELESS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15,17-19 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 3,4 *; | [X] - ALEXIOU A ET AL, "Re-configurable linear precoders to compensate for antenna correlation in orthogonal and quasi-orthogonal space-time block coded systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040517), ISBN 0-7803-8255-2, pages 665 - 669, XP010765829 [X] 1,3,6,8-13,17-19 * page 665, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 667, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2004.1388912 | [A] - XU XIN ET AL, "Space Diversity Schemes for STBC-Based MIMO Systems and Pre-FDE SIMO Systems", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050911), ISBN 978-3-8007-29, pages 1160 - 1164, XP010926354 [A] 1-19 * page 1161, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1163 * | [A] - SAMPATH H ET AL, "Pre-equalization for MIMO wireless channels with delay spread", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20000924), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-6507-0, pages 1175 - 1178, XP010524685 [A] 1,2,13,14 * page 1176, column 2, paragraph L * * figure 1 * | [A] - JAFARKHANI H, "A quasi-orthogonal space-time block code", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERNCE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000923), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-6596-8, pages 42 - 45, XP010532464 [A] 1,3,13,15 * page 43, column 2, paragraph 3 * |