EP1859907 - Multipurpose folding tool with tool bit holder and blade lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leatherman Tool Group, Inc. 12106 N.E. Ainsworth Circle Portland Oregon 97220 / US | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rivera, Benjamin C. 19485 Suncrest Drive West Linn Oregon 97068 / US | 02 /
Tsuda, Hollan A. 7464 N.E. Avalon Drive Corvallis Oregon 97330 / US | 03 /
Knight, Nathan E. 1933 NE 60th Avenue Portland Oregon 97213 / US | 04 /
Yale, Melissa C. 1500 NE 5th Avenue Apt. 240 Portland Oregon 97232 / US | 05 /
Klecker, Glenn 216 Brown Street Silverton Oregon 97381 / US | 06 /
Srajer, Reinhard 2401 SE 146th Avenue Vancouver Washington, 98683 / US | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Rivera, Benjamin C. 19485 Suncrest Drive West Linn Oregon 97068 / US | ||
02 /
Tsuda, Hollan A. 17585 NW Santiam Drive Portland Oregon 97229 / US | |||
03 /
Knight, Nathan E. 1933 NE 60th Avenue Portland Oregon 97213 / US | |||
04 /
Yale, Melissa C. 1500 NE 5th Avenue Apt. 240 Portland Oregon 97232 / US | |||
05 /
Klecker, Glenn 216 Brown Street Silverton Oregon 97381 / US | |||
06 /
Srajer, Reinhard 2401 SE 146th Avenue Vancouver Washington, 98683 / US | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016286.2 | 08.11.2004 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | US20040756032 | 13.01.2004 Original published format: US 756032 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859907 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1859907 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859907 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/00, B25B23/00, B25B15/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
B25F1/003 (EP,US);
B25B15/001 (EP,US);
B25B23/0035 (EP,US);
B25F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbares Mehrzweckwerkzeug mit Werkzeugteilhalter und Schaufelverschluss | [2007/48] | English: | Multipurpose folding tool with tool bit holder and blade lock | [2007/48] | French: | Outil pliant polyvalent doté d'un porte-pointes d'outil et d'un verrou de lame | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 06.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04026478.0 / EP1557242 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | BE | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | PL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | IE | 08.11.2009 | LU | 08.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 08.11.2009 | ||
LU | 08.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.11.2009 | ||
LU | 08.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US896746 (MCCARTY WILLIAM B [US]) [A] 28,29 * page 1, lines 44-48 ** page 1, lines 63-78; figure - *; | [A]US5280659 (PARK NO K [KR]) [A] 19,20,22 * column 2, lines 54-66; figures 2,5 *; | [A]EP0693018 (HABERMEHL G LYLE [US]) [A] 19,22 * column 4, lines 5-8 * * column 8, lines 7-14; figures 7,8,10,11 *; | [A]EP0744251 (BEST WAY TOOLS BY ANDERSON INC [US]) [A] 19 * figure - *; | [A]EP0782903 (WENGER SA [CH]) [A] 19 * abstract *; | [A]WO9937446 (SEBERTECH L L C [US]) [A] 9,10,14 * figures 5-11 *; | [DA]US6014787 (RIVERA BENJAMIN C [US]) [DA] 1-3,14,16,18 * column 5, lines 50-60 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 8; figures 1,5,9,14,15 *; | [DA]US6282996 (BERG HOWARD G [US], et al) [DA] 1,9,10,12,14,16,18-20,22 * column 10, lines 31-47 * * column 12, lines 15-21; figure - *; | [A]US2002138913 (PING QIU JIAN [CN]) [A] 15 * paragraph [0023]; figures 5-8 * |