EP2028421 - Monitoring of a flame existence and a flame temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilbraham, Nigel 44, Coldstream Drive Stourbridge, West DY8 5QZ Wordsley Midlands / GB | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 07016386.0 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028421 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/08 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F23N5/082 (EP,US);
F02B77/085 (EP,US);
F02B77/089 (EP,US);
F02D35/022 (EP,US);
F23D2208/10 (EP,US);
F23N2229/00 (EP,US);
F23N2900/05005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/44] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überwachung der Flammenanwesenheit und der Flammentemperatur | [2009/09] | English: | Monitoring of a flame existence and a flame temperature | [2009/09] | French: | Surveillance de la présence d'une flamme et de la température de la flamme | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102005020328 (RAG AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] , [0021] , [0027]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2006067389 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 6,8,9,14,15,17,18 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraphs 2,5,6; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5578828 (BROWN DALE M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,13,14 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 23 - line 53 * * column 6, line 11 - line 16 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 25 * [Y] 8-12,22; | [Y]EP0448310 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 8-11 * column 5, line 5 - line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5777668 (AMANO HIRO [JP]) [Y] 9,12,21 * column 6, line 29 - line 42 * * column 8, line 10 - line 52 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4422323 (LINDER ERNST [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,15,16,19,20 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 32 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 17,18,21,22; | [Y]EP0593413 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [Y] 17,18 * page 3, line 11 - line 20 *; | [X]GB1286651 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 53 - line 73 *; | [X]US2007059655 (BRUNNER PHILIPP [CH], et al) [X] 6 * paragraphs [0010] , [0018] , [0024]; figure 3d *; | [X]US2003106536 (SASS HEIKO [DE], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0017] *; | [A]WO9811388 (UNISON IND LP [US]) [A] 13,22 * column 17, line 9 - column 18, line 9 * | by applicant | WO2006067389 | US5578828 | US4422323 | GB1286651 | US2007059655 | US2003106536 |