EP2028079 - Screening element and screening assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElringKlinger Abschirmtechnik (Schweiz) AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevelen SG / CH | [2010/11] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states ElringKlinger Abschirmtechnik (Schweiz) AG Schildstrasse 12 9475 Sevelen SG / CH | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Sevex AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevelen SG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenring, Thomas, Dr. c/o Sevex AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevex SG / CH | 02 /
Olliges, Dieter c/o Sevex AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevex SG / CH | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
Eisenring, Thomas, Dr. Sevex AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevex SG / CH | ||
02 /
Olliges, Dieter Sevex AG Schildstrasse 20 9475 Sevex SG / CH | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Bartels & Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Bartels & Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016410.8 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028079 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028079 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16, B60R13/08 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B62D1/16 (EP);
B60R13/0853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Abschirmelement und Abschirmanordnung | [2009/09] | English: | Screening element and screening assembly | [2009/09] | French: | Elément de blindage et agencement de blindage | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | LV | 17.03.2010 | MT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | LU | 22.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
LU | 22.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 17.03.2010 | |
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1580321 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]JPS5950861 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE1580321 | JPS5950861 | DE102006002992 |