EP1898454 - Alkaline etching method for a semiconductor wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/11] | Alkaline etching solution for semiconductor wafer and alkaline etching method | ||
[2009/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shigeki, Nishimura 7-14-10 Shimata Hikari Yamaguchi, 743-0063 / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Baar, Christian, et al c/o Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Baar, Christian, et al c/o Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016454.6 | 22.08.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | JP20060243350 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006243350 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1898454 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1898454 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898454 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306, C01B11/20 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C01B11/20 (EP,US);
H01L21/3063 (KR);
H01L21/02019 (EP,US);
H01L21/30608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/07] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Alkalisches Ätzverfahren für einen Halbleiterwafer | [2009/24] | English: | Alkaline etching method for a semiconductor wafer | [2009/24] | French: | Procédé de décapage alcalin pour une tranche semi-conductrice | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/11] | Alkalin-Ätzlösung für einen Halbleiter-Wafer und Alkanin-Ätzverfahren | ||
Former [2008/11] | Alkaline etching solution for semiconductor wafer and alkaline etching method | ||
Former [2008/11] | Solution de décapage alcalin pour tranche semi-conductrice et procédé de décapage alcalin | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1278499 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9,12 * page 1, lines 12-23 * * page 2, lines 10-110 * * page 3, lines 37-42 * * page 4, lines 80-93 *; | [X]GB1588843 (IBM) [X] 1,5 * claims 1,4 *; | [XP]EP1717286 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] *; | [X]US2003136941 (VOHRA RAJINDER NATH [IN], et al) [X] 1,3 * example 7 *; | [A]WO2004027840 (MEMC ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 82,87 * | Examination | US1923618 | by applicant | JP2003229392 | GB1278499 |