EP1897469 - Piece of upholstered furniture and backrest for a piece of upholstered furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wimtex Möbelhandels GmbH Frohnlacher Strasse 14 96242 Sonnefeld / DE | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Alexander Chardtstrasse 21 38350 Helmstedt / DE | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016521.2 | 23.08.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | DE20061043271 | 11.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043271 | [2008/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1897469 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47C20/02 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
A47C20/023 (EP);
A47C7/546 (EP,US);
A47C20/027 (EP);
A47C7/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/47] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polstermöbelstück und Lehneneinheit für ein Polstermöbelstück | [2008/11] | English: | Piece of upholstered furniture and backrest for a piece of upholstered furniture | [2008/11] | French: | Elément de meuble rembourré et unité de dossier pour un élément de meuble rembourré | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2034803 (UOP INC) [X] 1-7,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5423098 (SWEZEY ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 4,9 *; | [X]EP0756964 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US6290298 (LEE SUNG JONG [KR]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10303234 (BAUER JOERG R [DE]) [A] 1,6,11* abstract * |