EP1867432 - Hand manipulated tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Full Circle International, Inc. 14817 Southcross Lane Burnsville, MN 55306 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Annis, Kent V. 14817 Southcross Lane Burnsville, Minnesota 55306 / US | 02 /
Harlow, Karl W. 5529 Basswood Circle Rockford, Minnesota 55373 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07016541.0 | 14.05.2004 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | US20030439836 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 439836 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867432 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B24D15/00, B25G3/38, B05C17/00, A47L13/10 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B24B7/184 (EP,US);
A47L13/24 (EP,US);
A47L13/29 (EP,US);
B24D15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | Handbetätigtes Werkzeug | [2007/51] | English: | Hand manipulated tool | [2007/51] | French: | Outil manuel | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04752247.9 / EP1633531 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB846413 (WILLIAM ARTHUR EVANS) [A] 15,16* figure 1 *; | [Y]US3105329 (SGORBATI SR RICHARD) [Y] 2-4 * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0351273 (PREMINES S A [FR]) [X] 1,7-11 * figure .; claim - * [Y] 2-6,12-14; | [XY]US5313746 (ZARRIELLO GERALD E [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,17-19 * figure - * [Y] 2-6,12-14; | [Y]GB2298379 (MILLER CORP LTD [GB]) [Y] 12-14 * figure 3 *; | [Y]GB2299038 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 2,5,6 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US6296558 (POOLE DANIEL L [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * column 2, lines 46-58 * * column 3, lines 8-30 * * column 4, lines 5-8; figure - * [Y] 2-6,12-14; | [XY]WO0245905 (DONLEN ABRASIVES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7-11,17-19 * page 6, lines 11-14; figure - * * page 8, lines 3-9 * [Y] 2-6,12-14 |